Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Conway, Astle, Benson, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Veto sustained (0-45)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to obtain adjusted census data and provide the census data to a temporary redistricting commission; creating a temporary redistricting commission; requiring the Commission to hold at least six public hearings and to include areas that reflect the State's geographic, racial, and ethnic diversity; requiring the Commission to prepare and adopt a districting plan and map for congressional districts; making the Act contingent on the enactment of a similar process by specified states; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294532/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294532/1 Adopted (30-15)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {643522/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {613529/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-28)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {883827/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (53-83)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {633125/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (52-81)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {563122/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (51-83)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2017
Legislative Date
5/08/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 4/9 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-45)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments {294532/1 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Zucker) Adopted 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments {294532/1 Adopted (30-15) 49
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Floor Amendment {643522/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (16-30) 49
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Floor Amendment {613529/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-28) 49
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 50
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Floor Amendment {883827/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (53-83) 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Floor Amendment {633125/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (52-81) 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Floor Amendment {563122/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (51-83) 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-51) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/08/2017 5/08/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 4/9 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Veto sustained (0-45)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6A-01 through 8-6A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM