Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Self-Referrals - Oncology Group Practices - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to establish a process to exempt one oncology group practice in certain geographic regions from a certain prohibition against self-referral; requiring the Commission to adopt regulations on or before a December 1, 2018 that include a certain application process to begin accepting applications on or before a April 1, 2019; requiring an oncology group practice applying for the exemption to submit an application to the Commission on the form the Commission requires; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1519
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Self-Referrals - Oncology Group Practices - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Self-Referrals - Oncology Group Practices - Exemption
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-302, 1-302.1, 1-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM