Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State Vendors
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, and Guzzone
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to retain an independent consultant to study certain matters concerning the impact, collection, and administration of the sales and use tax with respect to sales or deliveries by out-of-state vendors to customers in the State; requiring the Department to report to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2019; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State Vendors
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48B
Text - Third - Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State Vendors
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM