Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland State Fair - Funding Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, and Robey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination of a requirement that the racecourse at Timonium receive at least a specified amount of funds from the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account that is not subject to a specified matching funds requirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM