Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "legislative action" in the Public Ethics Law to include specified testimony or advocacy; prohibiting an official or employee from using the prestige of office to influence the award of a State or local government contract to a specific person; altering the definition of "close economic association" to include associations between a legislator and an entity with which employment is negotiated or prearranged; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-506, 5-512, 5-513, 5-514, 5-601, 5-602, 5-606, 5-607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM