Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Junkyards and Scrap Metal Processing Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "junkyard" and "scrap metal processing facility" as those definitions apply to the regulation of those facilities near certain highways in the State; authorizing only scrap metal processing facilities and junkyards, as defined in the Act, to purchase scrap metal by weight across an on-site scale; providing that certain provisions of law governing scrap metal processing facilities and junkyards preempt and supersede any conflicting local law; increasing certain penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Junkyards and Scrap Metal Processing Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Business Regulation - Junkyards and Scrap Metal Processing Facilities
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-1011, 17-1013 )
(   8-801, 8-809.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM