Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a specified limitations period on an action for injunctive relief or damages for a violation of a collective bargaining agreement covering an employee of the State or a political subdivision of the State or a breach by an exclusive representative of the duty of fair representation owed to an employee of the State or a political subdivision of the State; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {137178/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {137178/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 51
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Text - Chapter - Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM