Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from refusing to underwrite, canceling, refusing to renew, rating a risk, or increasing a renewal premium based, in whole or in part, on the marital status or employment or occupation of or education level attained by the insured or applicant; repealing specified provisions of law authorizing an insurer, under specified circumstances, to use the credit history of an applicant to rate a new policy of private passenger motor vehicle insurance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0749 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM