Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rural Health Care Scholarship and Grant Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Rural Health Care Scholarship and Grant Program to increase the availability of primary health care in rural areas of the State by providing financial assistance to certain students and health care professionals; requiring a recipient of a certain scholarship or grant award to provide certain health-related services in a rural area of the State for 1 year for each year the individual received the award; requiring funds for the Program to be provided in the Governor's annual budget for the Higher Education Commission; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Rural Health Care Scholarship and Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Rural Health Care Scholarship and Grant Program - Established
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM