Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for Schools
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making specified provisions of law concerning the advertising for bids for specified procurements costing more than $25,000 apply to construction-related projects for schools in Baltimore County; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1329
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-112, 5-112.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM