Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally or willfully destroying or damaging a domesticated animal of another person while hunting or pursuing wildlife in specified areas.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1482
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154137/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154137/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {910716/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-2)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {154137/1 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 50
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {154137/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {910716/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-2) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-410, 10-424 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM