Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - DROP
Sponsored by
Senators McFadden and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Deferred Retirement Option Program for members in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who have at least 20 years and less than 25 years of eligibility service; requiring the State Retirement Agency to request specified documentation from the Internal Revenue Service; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM