Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 2 to 3 the maximum number of days per week that the Department of Natural Resources may authorize a specified dredge boat to operate under the power of an auxiliary yawl boat while dredging for oysters in the Chesapeake Bay.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1505
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM