Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a secured party to petition a circuit court for leave to immediately commence an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property if the property is vacant and abandoned under specified circumstances; requiring a secured party to send a copy of a specified petition to specified persons under specified circumstances; requiring a court to rule on a specified petition promptly after the petition is filed; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0702
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {668574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Senate 3/09/2017 3/10/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {668574/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Text - Chapter - Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 7-105.14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM