Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student Organizations
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Bates, Cassilly, Hershey, Norman, Ready, Reilly, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the right to an attorney or a nonattorney advocate for a student or student organization at public senior higher education institutions at certain disciplinary proceedings designed to address a violation of the institution's rules; requiring certain represented persons to pay for the attorney or nonattorney advocate; authorizing the attorney or nonattorney advocate to participate throughout the disciplinary proceedings, including by performing certain services; applying the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0603
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student Organizations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1401 through 11-1408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM