Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County Board of Education - Filling a Vacancy in Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law concerning the filling of a vacancy on the Queen Anne's County Board of Education; providing for the holding of an election to fill a vacancy on the county board under specified circumstances; and providing that a member appointed by the Governor to fill a vacancy on the county board serves only for a specified period.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1033
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-10A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM