Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Pocomoke and the Board of Directors of the Delmarva Discovery Center & Museum, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum, located in Worcester County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a specified requirement; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1573
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2017 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 191). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 191 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM