Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Laboratories - Use or Sale of Data for Research Study and Advertising or Solicitation of Business
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a medical laboratory from using or selling to another person certain data for use in a research study unless a certain individual provides consent to the medical laboratory; repealing a prohibition on certain advertising or solicitation of business for a medical laboratory; and authorizing a certain person to advertise or solicit business in the State for a medical laboratory under certain circumstances: etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Medical Laboratories - Use or Sale of Data for Research Study and Advertising or Solicitation of Business
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-202.2, 17-215 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM