Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and Taxes
Sponsored by
Senators King, Brinkley, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Garagiola, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Miller, Peters, Robey, and McFadden
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified out-of-state businesses and out-of-state employees do not have a presence in the State that subjects the businesses or employees to specified licensing or registration requirements, income taxes, unemployment insurance contributions, personal property tax, or any requirement to collect and remit the sales tax; exempting specified businesses and employees from income taxes and withholding requirements; requiring specified businesses to provide a specified statement; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1513
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {149437/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2013 3/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {149437/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-203, 14-219 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM