Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Montgomery Village Martin Roy Park Pavilion
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to alter the location of a grant for the pavilion in Montgomery Village; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1522
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2013 3/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page