Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the elements of a specified drug-related driving offense and a specified drug-related operation of a vessel offense; eliminating a specified defense to specified drug-related offenses; increasing specified criminal penalties for specified drug-related offenses; altering specified administrative penalties for specified drug-related driving offenses; requiring a person who is convicted of specified drug-related driving offenses to undergo a mental health assessment and participate in specified programs; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1364
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
(   10-302, 10-303, 10-305, 10-306, 10-308 )
(   2-505, 2-507, 3-211, 3-212 )
(   11-109.1, 16-205, 16-205.1, 16-402, 18-105, 21-902, 26-202, 26-404, 26-405, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page