Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to establish reimbursement levels, rather than maximum reimbursement levels, for certain drug products; requiring that certain minimum reimbursement levels be at least equal to the National Average Drug Acquisition Cost of the generic product plus a certain fee-for-service professional dispensing fee; providing that certain provisions of the Act apply to managed care organizations that use pharmacy benefits managers to manage prescription drug coverage; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1324
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM