Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services
Sponsored by
Senators Garagiola, Astle, Glassman, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kittleman, Mathias, Middleton, Pipkin, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Modifying specified standards for involuntary admissions of individuals with mental disorders to specified facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital under specified circumstances; modifying specified standards for emergency evaluations of individuals with mental disorders under specified circumstances; modifying specified standards for clinical review panel approval; establishing the Task Force on the Delivery of Services to Individuals with Mental Illness; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1258
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187471/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2013 3/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {187471/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-613, 10-617, 10-620, 10-622, 10-623, 10-626, 10-631, 10-631 through 10-633, 10-633, 10-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM