Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee and Senators Ferguson, Guzzone, King, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing or altering the distribution of certain revenue; altering or repealing certain required appropriations; altering the cap for fiscal 2020 from 0.5% to 0.25% on a certain adjustment to a certain revenue estimate relating to nonwithholding income tax revenues; altering, for fiscal year 2020, a certain budgeted Medicaid Deficit Assessment; authorizing the transfer of certain funds; authorizing the use of $2,000,000 from the Maryland Trauma Physician Services Fund for Medicaid provider reimbursements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1407
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Senate 3/05/2019 3/06/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-117.1 )
(   2011, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM