Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals, in accordance with a specified building code, to affirm, modify, or reverse the order, requirement, or decision that is the subject of an appeal before the Board; providing that a decision of the Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals is final, subject to appeal to the County Commissioners of Washington County under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1511
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2013 3/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM