Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman, Sydnor, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which a lawsuit is considered a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP suit); specifying the conditions under which a lawsuit is not considered a SLAPP suit; altering the conditions under which a defendant in a SLAPP suit is not civilly liable for certain communications; providing for a plaintiff's burden and the award of certain fees in connection with a motion to dismiss; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0379
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0768 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/10/2020 2:31 PM