Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Acceleration of Loan Indebtedness Due to Death - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified loan and credit agreements from containing a specified acceleration clause in which any part or all of the unpaid balance may be declared due and payable due solely to the death of a borrower, debtor, or guarantor; establishing, notwithstanding specified provisions of the Act, that a lender or credit grantor is not obligated to extend additional credit or make any cash advance to a specified person under specified circumstances; providing for the scope of specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2013 3/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1023.2, 12-125.1, 12-311.1, 12-409, 12-923.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM