Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings (By Request)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, for purposes of determining eligibility for the homeowners' property tax credit, specified limitations on a homeowner's combined net worth and gross income amounts for credits granted for taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017, based on a specified cost-of-living adjustment percentage; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM