Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Requirements - Standard Offer Service
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Manno, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company to contract for specified renewable energy credits and electricity generated from specified Tier 1 renewable sources to meet at least 25% of the renewable energy portfolio standard for the electricity that the electric company provides to specified customers beginning in 2018; requiring an electric company to solicit bids for a specified contract from specified renewable energy facilities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1452
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Requirements - Standard Offer Service
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-703.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM