Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Competitive Retail Electricity and Gas Supply - Consumer Protection - Report
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Benson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to report to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015, on the status of the Commission's efforts to provide appropriate protections for consumers in connection with competitive retail electricity supply and retail gas supply and recommendations regarding ratepayer protections; specifying the contents of the report; requiring the Commission to convene a workgroup of interested persons, including retail electricity suppliers, to advise the Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0928
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447876/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513490/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments {447876/1 Report Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 42
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 45
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {513490/1 Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 60
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM