Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic Violence
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic Violence; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding how to protect the identity and address of a participant in the Address Confidentiality Program for victims of domestic violence in the Office of the Secretary of State when recording a deed transferring real property to or from a Program participant; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {778379/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {370011/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {778379/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 52
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {370011/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM