Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Recorded Covenants – Substantially Changed Circumstances
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that a recorded covenant affecting property owned by a certain cemetery company be rendered invalid by substantially changed circumstances if, since the execution of the covenant, at least 100 years have elapsed and a State highway has been constructed on adjoining property.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Senate Rules 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Real Property – Recorded Covenants – Substantially Changed Circumstances
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM