Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Required Number of School Days - Exception
Sponsored by
Senators Getty, Conway, Dyson, Jennings, Montgomery, Reilly, Simonaire, and Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to grant specified county boards of education specified adjustments and exceptions for school attendance if attendance is prevented on a day that the Governor declares a state of emergency; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814239/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {814239/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM