Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (96-36)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution in the Executive Department; requiring certain civil suits involving asbestos claims to be referred to the Office for mediation; providing for the priority of certain civil suits in the mediation process; requiring all parties referred to the Office to participate in mediation subject to a certain condition; requiring the Director of the Office to notify the court if certain parties are unable to reach agreement through mediation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228179/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228179/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {252612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (112-21)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-36)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 53
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 53
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 53
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {228179/1 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {228179/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments {252612/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (112-21) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-36) 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-18A-01 through 3-18A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM