Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight Limits
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing dump trucks registered in the State to exceed the motor vehicle's maximum gross vehicle weight by 3,000 pounds.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1479
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight Limits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight Limits
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-919 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM