Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, and Robinson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a judicial officer to give a certain individual taken into custody on a body attachment the opportunity to make a complete declaration on a certain form; requiring a judicial officer to release an individual on personal recognizance without any additional conditions, advise the individual of certain matters, and provide a copy of a certain declaration to a certain judgment creditor; authorizing a judicial officer to release an individual on personal recognizance under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1081
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688376/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-5)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {688376/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (39-5) 48
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Judiciary 47
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM