Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Entry Onto School Property
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Salling, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain exception authorizing, under certain circumstances, a student who is a registered sex offender to enter onto real property used for public or nonpublic elementary or secondary education; requiring a county board of education to adopt a policy that enables a student who is a registered sex offender to continue receiving a certain education in a location other than real property used for certain educational purposes; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt guidelines and a model policy; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {648976/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Entry Onto School Property
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {648976/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Entry Onto School Property
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Referred Judiciary 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/10/2020 2:31 PM