Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit in an amount not to exceed the lesser of $2,500 per dwelling or the amount of property tax imposed on the dwelling for certain 9-1-1 public safety telecommunicators in the county or municipal corporation where the individuals reside; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators - Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {949730/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators - Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {125364/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Credit - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators - Benefits
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {949730/1 Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators - Benefits
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments {125364/1 Adopted 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Credit - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM