Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Arts and Entertainment Districts - Qualifying Residing Artists
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of qualifying residing artist for an arts and entertainment district to include individuals who own or rent residential real property in the State and who conduct business and derive income in specified areas; altering the eligibility for specified individuals to claim specified tax incentives; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1516
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-701, 4-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM