Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias and Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified carriers from prohibiting an enrollee from selecting, or limiting the ability of an enrollee to select, a specified pharmacy for the receipt of specified services; prohibiting specified carriers, under specified circumstances, from denying a pharmacy a specified right or imposing on an enrollee specified payments, fees, reimbursement amounts, limitations, or conditions for specified services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1121
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-2001 through 15-2005, 15-805, 15-806, 15-847 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM