Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Jones-Rodwell, Shank, and Muse
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield court records and police records relating to specified convictions at a specified time; providing that, if a person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, the original conviction is not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; providing that a person is not eligible for shielding if the person is a defendant in a pending criminal proceeding; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1006 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {258871/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {453023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {993524/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {258871/2 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {453023/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {993524/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 59
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM