Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing provisions of law governing the rental of personal motor vehicles to other persons in a specified manner; establishing that specified persons may rent only specified classes of personal motor vehicles to other persons; prohibiting a renter of a personal motor vehicle from using the motor vehicle for specified purposes; prohibiting a person from renting a personal motor vehicle to another person unless the motor vehicle is covered by specified security; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1520
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Reassigned to Finance 26
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301 )
(   18-101.1, 18-201 through 18-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM