Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a license holder in Cecil County to ensure that each individual employed in a supervisory capacity and each bartender at a licensed premises be certified by an approved alcohol awareness program; requiring at least one certified individual to be present on the licensed premises at all times when alcoholic beverages may be sold; providing that, if at least 5 years have elapsed since a certain violation, a certain subsequent violation will be considered a first offense for a certain purpose; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0411
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174733/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {174733/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 47
Text - Third - Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Economic Matters 46
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-102, 17-1901, 17-1903, 17-2802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM