Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - The Reasonable School Discipline Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a principal from suspending or expelling a student who brings to school or possesses on school property a picture of a gun, a computer image of a gun, a facsimile of a gun, or any other object that resembles a gun but serves another purpose; prohibiting a principal from suspending or expelling a student who makes a hand shape or gesture resembling a gun; authorizing a principal to suspend or expel a student who performs a specified action as a direct act of violence against another student; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jennings) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Referred Senate Rules 40
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-306.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM