Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Application Fees - Prospective Tenants Who Receive Housing Assistance
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landlord from requesting or accepting an application fee from a prospective tenant who intends to use, for the payment of rent, a form of government housing assistance that the landlord will not accept; requiring a landlord who violates the Act to refund the application fee to the prospective tenant; and establishing that a landlord who violates the Act is liable to the prospective tenant for damages equal to three times the amount of the application fee.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Referred Senate Rules 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Raskin) Adopted 40
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
(   8-213.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page