Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for each of fiscal years 2022 through 2025 an appropriation of $1,000,000 to Morgan State University to enhance the Office of Technology Transfer and increase the capacity of the Office to move technology into the marketplace; and extending the termination date of the provisions requiring the implementation of the plan to enhance the Office of Technology Transfer from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2025.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 2:49 PM