Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the system of active intervention for specified truant students developed by each county board of education to include an Individualized Reengagement Plan for each truant student, coordination and collaboration with State and municipal agencies to deliver services, creation of a database to track truant students, and a specific plan for each public school to reengage truant students; requiring the Individualized Reengagement Plan to be developed by specified individuals using a specified process; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0363
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-302.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM