Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that authorize Sunday deer hunting on private property in specified counties during specified times of the year under specified circumstances; and authorizing a person to hunt deer on a Sunday, with specified exceptions, on private property during deer firearms season and deer muzzleloader season from one half hour before sunrise until 10:30 a.m.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/22/2016 3/23/2016 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-410, 10-410.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM