Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing voters who have declined to affiliate with a political party to affiliate with a party at any time individuals may register to vote; requiring an election judge to follow certain procedures to determine the voter's qualifications if a voter who has declined to affiliate with a political party requests to affiliate with a party during early voting; altering provisions relating to early voting to allow voters who have declined to affiliate with a political party to affiliate with a party and be issued a ballot to vote; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0280
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0064 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-303, 3-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM