Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain person to attach a copy of an order of the court establishing parentage to a certificate of birth under certain circumstances; requiring, for a birth involving a gestational carrier in which parentage is determined by a certain court, that a certain person enter certain information on the forms provided by the Secretary of Health and attach a certain order to the forms; requiring the Division of Vital Records to immediately take certain actions on receipt of certain documents; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1635
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judiciary Health and Government Operations 49A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM